House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4087 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1791 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 532 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |