LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1574
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1574
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1574
Compare Versions
SB1574 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1574 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1574 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1574 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB1574 Engrossed April 23, 2015
SB1574 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
SB1574 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1574 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1574 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1574 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1574 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
SB1574 Engrossed April 23, 2015
SB1574 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
SB1574 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare