E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2721
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2721
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2721
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2716
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4480
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1439
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4441
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4441
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 4440
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4440
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2437
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Emerging Issues In Texas Law Enforcement, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1054
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 135
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 135
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|