E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/21/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1198
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3796
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3796
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|