LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1593
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1593
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1593
Compare Versions
SB1593 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1593 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1593 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1593 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB1593 Engrossed May 5, 2015
SB1593 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB1593 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1593 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1593 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1593 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1593 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB1593 Engrossed May 5, 2015
SB1593 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB1593 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare