Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1600 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1600
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 29, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1600 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a limit on the award of attorney's fees in certain
 proceedings brought against the state or an agency of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.009, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.009.  COSTS.  (a)  Subject to Subsection (b), in a
 [In any] proceeding under this chapter, the court may award costs
 and reasonable and necessary attorney's fees as are equitable and
 just.
 (b)  In a proceeding under this chapter in which declaratory
 relief is sought against the state or an agency of the state, the
 amount of attorney's fees awarded may not exceed $250,000.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a proceeding commenced on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A proceeding commenced before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law applicable to the proceeding immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *