House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA14 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 538
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 538
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|