House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2062 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |