House | 05/25/2015 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4574 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2022 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Menndez | Journal Page: 1841 |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1840 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1504 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 707 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |