E | 06/10/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/10/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/21/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1850 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4082 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | RV#1225 | Journal Page: 3857 |
House | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3819 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3819 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2349 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 758 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |