Senate | 05/26/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |