E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3815
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1204
|
Journal Page: 3815
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3815
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3815
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3740
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3740
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 622
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 637
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 421
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 311
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|