House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 410 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 410 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA22 Ellis | Journal Page: 409 |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 409 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 407 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Point of order sustained | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Point of order | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 388 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 387 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 387 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 02/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |