Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4935
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2176
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4477
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1436
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4416
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1415
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
14-Zerwas, R. Miller, Walle, Farias, Sheets, Dale, C. Anderson, and Blanco
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
13-M. White
|
Journal Page: 4415
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4414
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4414
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/24/15 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
13-M. White, Blanco, and J. White
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
9-Blanco
|
Journal Page: 4377
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
12-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 4376
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
11-C. Anderson
|
Journal Page: 4376
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
3-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
3-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Blanco
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/24/15 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2837
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2673
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1331
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA8 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1326
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1248
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|