E | 05/22/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1470 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2910 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#823 | Journal Page: 2910 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2910 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2910 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#747 | Journal Page: 2786 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2786 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2786 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 4:50 PM | Journal Page: 2784 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2784 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2897 | Journal Page: 2784 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 953 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 827 |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 760 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |