E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3619
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1793
|
Journal Page: 5829
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5829
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6024
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3539
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5560
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5560
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5211
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2859
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1966
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1324
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4177
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4122
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3946
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Dale
|
Journal Page: 3945
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3945
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|