Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 11/12/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |