Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1771 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1771
 (VanDeaver)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 7.0561(b), (c), (d), and (j), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The Texas High Performance Schools Consortium is
 established to inform the governor, legislature, State Board of
 Education, and commissioner concerning methods for transforming
 public schools in this state by improving student learning through
 the development of innovative, next-generation learning standards
 and assessment and accountability systems.
 (c)  From among school districts and eligible
 open-enrollment charter schools that apply using the form and in
 the time and manner established by commissioner rule, the
 commissioner may select not more than 30 [20] participants for the
 consortium.  The districts selected by the commissioner must
 represent a range of district types, sizes, and diverse student
 populations, as determined by the commissioner in accordance with
 commissioner rule.  To be eligible to participate in the
 consortium, an open-enrollment charter school must have been
 awarded a [an exemplary] distinction designation under Subchapter
 G, Chapter 39, during the preceding school year.
 (d)  The number of students enrolled in consortium
 participants may not be greater than a number equal to 10 [five]
 percent of the total number of students enrolled in public schools
 in this state according to the most recent agency data.
 (j)  The [With the assistance of the] school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools participating in the consortium[,
 the commissioner] shall submit reports concerning the performance
 and progress of the consortium to the governor, [and] the
 legislature, the State Board of Education, and the commissioner not
 later than December 1 of each even-numbered year[, 2012, and not
 later than December 1, 2014].  [The report submitted not later than
 December 1, 2012, must include any recommendation by the
 commissioner concerning legislative authorization for the
 commissioner to waive a prohibition, requirement, or restriction
 that applies to a consortium participant.    That report must also
 include a plan for an effective and efficient accountability system
 for consortium participants that balances academic excellence and
 local values to inspire learning and, at the state level,
 contingent on any necessary waiver of federal law, may incorporate
 use of a stratified random sampling of students or other objective
 methodology to hold consortium participants accountable while
 attempting to reduce the number of state assessment instruments
 that are required to be administered to students.    The commissioner
 shall seek a federal waiver, to any extent necessary, to prepare for
 implementation of the plan if enacted by the legislature.    This
 subsection expires January 1, 2018.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.