House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4806
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1159
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|