Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1804 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1804
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 6, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1804 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to low income housing tax credits awarded for at-risk
 developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.6702(a)(5), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (5)  "At-risk development" means:
 (A)  a development that:
 (i)  has received the benefit of a subsidy in
 the form of a below-market interest rate loan, interest rate
 reduction, rental subsidy, Section 8 housing assistance payment,
 rental supplement payment, rental assistance payment, or equity
 incentive under the following federal laws, as applicable:
 (a)  Sections 221(d)(3) and (5),
 National Housing Act (12 U.S.C. Section 1715l);
 (b)  Section 236, National Housing Act
 (12 U.S.C. Section 1715z-1);
 (c)  Section 202, Housing Act of 1959
 (12 U.S.C. Section 1701q);
 (d)  Section 101, Housing and Urban
 Development Act of 1965 (12 U.S.C. Section 1701s);
 (e)  the Section 8 Additional
 Assistance Program for housing developments with HUD-Insured and
 HUD-Held Mortgages administered by the United States Department of
 Housing and Urban Development as specified by 24 C.F.R. Part 886,
 Subpart A;
 (f)  the Section 8 Housing Assistance
 Program for the Disposition of HUD-Owned Projects administered by
 the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development as
 specified by 24 C.F.R. Part 886, Subpart C;
 (g)  Sections 514, 515, and 516,
 Housing Act of 1949 (42 U.S.C. Sections 1484, 1485, and 1486); or
 (h)  Section 42, Internal Revenue Code
 of 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section 42); and
 (ii)  is subject to the following
 conditions:
 (a)  the stipulation to maintain
 affordability in the contract granting the subsidy is nearing
 expiration; or
 (b)  the federally insured mortgage on
 the development is eligible for prepayment or is nearing the end of
 its term; or
 (B)  a development that proposes to rehabilitate
 or reconstruct housing units that:
 (i)  are owned by a public housing authority
 and receive assistance under Section 9, United States Housing Act
 of 1937 (42 U.S.C. Section 1437g); [or]
 (ii)  received assistance under Section 9,
 United States Housing Act of 1937 (42 U.S.C. Section 1437g) and:
 (a)  are proposed to be disposed of or
 demolished by a public housing authority; or
 (b)  have been disposed of or
 demolished by a public housing authority in the two-year period
 preceding the application for housing tax credits; or
 (iii)  receive assistance or will receive
 assistance through the Rental Assistance Demonstration program
 administered by the United States Department of Housing and Urban
 Development as specified by the Consolidated and Further Continuing
 Appropriations Act of 2012 (Pub. L. No. 112-55) and its subsequent
 amendments, if:
 (a)  the application for assistance
 through the Rental Assistance Demonstration program is included in
 the applicable public housing authority's annual plan that was most
 recently approved by the United States Department of Housing and
 Urban Development as specified by 24 C.F.R. Section 903.23; and
 (b)  the applicant certifies in
 writing that the application for assistance through the Rental
 Assistance Demonstration program is consistent with that
 authority's obligation to affirmatively further fair housing.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for low income housing tax credits that is
 submitted on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 application for low income housing tax credits that is submitted
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect when the application was submitted, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *