Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1812 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst, Schwertner S.B. No. 1812


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to transparency in the reporting and public availability
 of information regarding eminent domain authority; providing a
 civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2206, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY REPORTING; PUBLIC
 AVAILABILITY
 Sec. 2206.151.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies to
 public and private entities, including common carriers, authorized
 by the state by a general or special law to exercise the power of
 eminent domain.
 Sec. 2206.152.  CREATION DATE. For the purposes of this
 subchapter, an entity described by Section 2206.151 is considered
 to have been created on:
 (1)  the earliest date on which the entity existed if
 the entity was authorized to exercise the power of eminent domain on
 that date; or
 (2)  the earliest date on which the entity was
 authorized to exercise the power of eminent domain if the entity did
 not have that authority on the earliest date on which the entity
 existed.
 Sec. 2206.153.  EMINENT DOMAIN DATABASE. (a)  The
 comptroller shall create and make accessible on an Internet website
 maintained by the comptroller an eminent domain database as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  The eminent domain database must include with respect to
 each entity described by Section 2206.151:
 (1)  the name of the entity;
 (2)  the entity's address and public contact
 information;
 (3)  the name of the appropriate officer or other
 person representing the entity and that person's contact
 information;
 (4)  the type of entity;
 (5)  each provision of law that grants the entity
 eminent domain authority;
 (6)  the focus or scope of the eminent domain authority
 granted to the entity;
 (7)  the location subject to the entity's eminent
 domain authority;
 (8)  the earliest date on which the entity had the
 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain;
 (9)  the entity's taxpayer identification number, if
 any;
 (10)  whether the entity exercised the entity's eminent
 domain authority in the preceding calendar year by the filing of a
 condemnation petition under Section 21.012, Property Code; and
 (11)  the entity's Internet website address or, if the
 entity does not operate an Internet website, contact information to
 enable a member of the public to obtain information from the entity.
 (c)  The comptroller may consult with the appropriate
 officer of, or other person representing, each entity to obtain the
 information necessary to maintain the eminent domain database.
 (d)  To the extent information required in the eminent domain
 database is otherwise collected or maintained by a state agency or
 political subdivision, the comptroller may request and the state
 agency or political subdivision shall provide that information and
 any update to the information as necessary for inclusion in the
 eminent domain database.
 (e)  At least annually, the comptroller shall update
 information in the eminent domain database for each entity, as
 appropriate.
 (f)  To the extent possible, the comptroller shall present
 information in the eminent domain database in a manner that is
 searchable and intuitive to users. The comptroller may enhance and
 organize the presentation of the information through the use of
 graphical representations as the comptroller considers
 appropriate.
 (g)  The comptroller may not charge a fee to the public to
 access the eminent domain database.
 Sec. 2206.154.  REPORTING OF INFORMATION TO THE COMPTROLLER.
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), not later than February
 1 of each year, an entity described by Section 2206.151 shall submit
 to the comptroller a report containing records and other
 information specified by this subchapter for the purpose of
 providing the comptroller with information to maintain the eminent
 domain database under Section 2206.153. The entity shall submit
 the report in a form and in the manner prescribed by the
 comptroller.
 (a-1)  An entity described by Section 2206.151 created
 before and in existence for at least 180 days on September 1, 2015,
 shall submit the entity's initial report under Subsection (a) not
 later than February 1, 2016. An entity described by Section
 2206.151 created before and in existence for less than 180 days on
 September 1, 2015, shall submit the entity's initial report under
 Subsection (a) not later than the later of the 180th day after the
 date of the entity's creation or February 1, 2016. This subsection
 expires December 1, 2016.
 (b)  An entity described by Section 2206.151 created on or
 after September 1, 2015, is not required to submit the entity's
 initial report under Subsection (a) before the 180th day after the
 date of the entity's creation.
 (c)  In addition to the annual report required under
 Subsection (a), an entity described by Section 2206.151 shall
 report to the comptroller any changes to the entity's eminent
 domain authority information reported under this section not later
 than the 90th day after the date on which the change occurred.
 Sec. 2206.155.  PENALTIES FOR NONCOMPLIANCE; EXPIRATION OF
 EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY. (a)  An entity described by Section
 2206.151 may not attempt to exercise the power of eminent domain by
 making an offer under Section 21.0113, Property Code, or filing a
 condemnation petition under Section 21.012, Property Code, at a
 time when the entity has not reported information to the
 comptroller as required by this subchapter.
 (b)  An entity that violates Subsection (a) and, as certified
 by the comptroller under Subsection (d), does not make the report
 required by Subsection (d) is liable to the state for a civil
 penalty not to exceed $1,000.  The attorney general may sue to
 collect the penalty.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide notice to an entity that
 violates Subsection (a) informing the entity that:
 (1)  the entity has violated Subsection (a); and
 (2)  the entity will be subject to the penalty imposed
 by this section and the entity's authority to exercise the power of
 eminent domain will expire if the entity does not report the
 information required by this subchapter on or before the 30th day
 after the date the notice is provided.
 (d)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the
 comptroller provides notice under Subsection (c) to an entity that
 violated Subsection (a), the entity must report the required
 information. If the comptroller certifies that the entity did not
 make the report as required by this subsection, the entity's
 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain expires on the day
 after the date the comptroller makes the certification.
 (e)  The comptroller shall promptly make a certification
 described by Subsection (d) when appropriate and post information
 regarding the expiration of an entity's eminent domain authority
 under this section in the eminent domain database maintained under
 Section 2206.153.
 Sec. 2206.156.  RULES. The comptroller may adopt rules and
 establish policies and procedures to implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall create
 and post on an Internet website maintained by the comptroller the
 eminent domain database required by Section 2206.153, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.