Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 11/13/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/13/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |