Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB183 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 183
 (In the Senate - Filed November 13, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 7, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 183 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offenses of the violation of civil rights of and
 improper sexual activity with individuals in custody; imposing a
 criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 39.04(a), (b), and (f), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An official of a correctional facility or juvenile
 facility, an employee of a correctional facility or juvenile
 facility, a person other than an employee who works for
 compensation at a correctional facility or juvenile facility, a
 volunteer at a correctional facility or juvenile facility, or a
 peace officer commits an offense if the person intentionally:
 (1)  denies or impedes a person in custody in the
 exercise or enjoyment of any right, privilege, or immunity knowing
 his conduct is unlawful; or
 (2)  engages in sexual contact, sexual intercourse, or
 deviate sexual intercourse with an individual in custody or, in the
 case of an individual in the custody of the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department or placed in a juvenile facility [Youth Commission],
 employs, authorizes, or induces the individual to engage in sexual
 conduct or a sexual performance.
 (b)  An offense under Subsection (a)(1) is a Class A
 misdemeanor.  An offense under Subsection (a)(2) is a state jail
 felony, except that an offense under Subsection (a)(2) is a felony
 of the second degree if the offense is committed against:
 (1)  an individual in the custody of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or placed in a juvenile facility [Youth
 Commission]; or
 (2)  a juvenile offender detained in or committed to a
 correctional facility [the operation of which is financed primarily
 with state funds].
 (f)  An employee of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice,
 the Texas Juvenile Justice Department [Youth Commission], a
 juvenile facility, or a local juvenile probation department commits
 an offense if the employee engages in sexual contact, sexual
 intercourse, or deviate sexual intercourse with an individual who
 the employee knows is under the supervision of the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice, Texas Juvenile Justice Department
 [department, commission], or probation department but not in the
 custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department [department, commission], or probation
 department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.04(e), Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivisions (1) and (2) and adding Subdivision (2-a) to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Correctional facility" means[:
 [(A)]  any place described by Section
 1.07(a)(14)[; or
 [(B)     a "secure correctional facility" or "secure
 detention facility" as defined by Section 51.02, Family Code].
 (2)  "Custody" means the detention, arrest, or
 confinement of an adult offender, [or] the detention of a juvenile
 offender, or the commitment of a juvenile offender to a
 correctional facility or juvenile facility [operated by or under a
 contract with the Texas Youth Commission or a facility operated by
 or under contract with a juvenile board].
 (2-a)  "Juvenile facility" means a facility for the
 detention or placement of juveniles under juvenile court
 jurisdiction and that is operated wholly or partly by the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department, a juvenile board, or another
 governmental unit or by a private vendor under a contract with the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department, juvenile board, or governmental
 unit.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *