Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Enrolled / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1831         By: Menndez         Transportation         7/23/2015         Enrolled    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1831
 By: Menndez
 Transportation
 7/23/2015
 Enrolled

Senate Research Center

S.B. 1831

 

By: Menndez

 

Transportation

 

7/23/2015

 

Enrolled

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   S.B. 1831 seeks to designate a portion of State Highway 151 as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.    Specialist Dane R. Balcon passed away on September 5, 2007, in Balad, Iraq, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom. Specialist Balcon died of injuries sustained when an improvised explosive device detonated near his vehicle.    From an early age, Dane dreamed of the opportunity to serve his country. His path to the military began at Sand Creek High School in 2002, where he joined the Army ROTC program. The staff and students at Sand Creek High School remembered Dane as an outstanding person and someone who had an absolute love for the military and serving his country. In 2007, immediately following graduation, Dane enlisted in the Army. He deployed to Balad, Iraq on July 7, 2007, with the 3rd Squadron 8th Cavalry Regiment, 1st Calvary Division from Fort Hood, Texas. On September 5, 2007, he completed his mission, making the ultimate sacrifice, protecting our freedom and security.   Specialist Balcon comes from a proud tradition of military service. Both his mother and father served in the military. They currently live and work near the site of the proposed memorial designation.   Specialist Balcon was a remarkable soldier and a devoted son who honorably served the nation he loved. S.B. 1831 offers the designation of State Highway 151 bridge as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge as an honorable tribute to thank him, Specialist Dane R. Balcon, and his family for his service to our country.   S.B. 1831 amends current law relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 151 as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, by adding Section 225.105, as follows:   Sec. 225.105. SPECIALIST DANE BALCON MEMORIAL BRIDGE. (a) Provides that the State Highway 151 bridge at Westover Hills in Bexar County is designated as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.   (b) Requires the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT), subject to Section 225.021(c) (prohibiting TxDOT from designing, constructing, or erecting a marker under this subchapter unless a grant or donation of funds is made to TxDOT to cover the cost of the design, construction, and erection of the marker), to:   (1) design and construct markers indicating the designation as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge, and any other appropriate information; and    (2) erect a marker at each end of the highway and at appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.  

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

S.B. 1831 seeks to designate a portion of State Highway 151 as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge. 

 

Specialist Dane R. Balcon passed away on September 5, 2007, in Balad, Iraq, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom. Specialist Balcon died of injuries sustained when an improvised explosive device detonated near his vehicle. 

 

From an early age, Dane dreamed of the opportunity to serve his country. His path to the military began at Sand Creek High School in 2002, where he joined the Army ROTC program. The staff and students at Sand Creek High School remembered Dane as an outstanding person and someone who had an absolute love for the military and serving his country. In 2007, immediately following graduation, Dane enlisted in the Army. He deployed to Balad, Iraq on July 7, 2007, with the 3rd Squadron 8th Cavalry Regiment, 1st Calvary Division from Fort Hood, Texas. On September 5, 2007, he completed his mission, making the ultimate sacrifice, protecting our freedom and security.

 

Specialist Balcon comes from a proud tradition of military service. Both his mother and father served in the military. They currently live and work near the site of the proposed memorial designation.

 

Specialist Balcon was a remarkable soldier and a devoted son who honorably served the nation he loved. S.B. 1831 offers the designation of State Highway 151 bridge as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge as an honorable tribute to thank him, Specialist Dane R. Balcon, and his family for his service to our country.

 

S.B. 1831 amends current law relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 151 as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code, by adding Section 225.105, as follows:

 

Sec. 225.105. SPECIALIST DANE BALCON MEMORIAL BRIDGE. (a) Provides that the State Highway 151 bridge at Westover Hills in Bexar County is designated as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.

 

(b) Requires the Texas Department of Transportation (TxDOT), subject to Section 225.021(c) (prohibiting TxDOT from designing, constructing, or erecting a marker under this subchapter unless a grant or donation of funds is made to TxDOT to cover the cost of the design, construction, and erection of the marker), to:

 

(1) design and construct markers indicating the designation as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge, and any other appropriate information; and 

 

(2) erect a marker at each end of the highway and at appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.