Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1831
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 151 as the
 Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.105.  SPECIALIST DANE BALCON MEMORIAL BRIDGE.
 (a)  The State Highway 151 bridge at Westover Hills in Bexar County
 is designated as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as the Specialist Dane Balcon
 Memorial Bridge, and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *