Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1831


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 151 as the
 Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.105.  SPECIALIST DANE BALCON MEMORIAL BRIDGE.
 (a)  The State Highway 151 bridge at Westover Hills in Bexar County
 is designated as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Specialist Dane Balcon Memorial Bridge and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1831 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor