Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1835 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1835
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 7, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 1; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1835 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the motor vehicle use tax for motor
 vehicles brought into this state by certain current or former
 military personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.022, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (d), the tax imposed by this
 section does not apply to a motor vehicle purchased at retail sale
 outside this state and used on the public highways of this state by
 a person who:
 (1)  is a current or former member of the United States
 armed forces; and
 (2)  purchased the motor vehicle while serving on
 active duty outside this state.
 (d)  The comptroller shall adopt rules prescribing the
 manner in which a person claiming an exemption under Subsection (c)
 must verify the person's eligibility for the exemption.  A person
 claiming an exemption under Subsection (c) shall provide to the
 person collecting the tax imposed under this chapter any
 information required by the comptroller to verify eligibility for
 the exemption.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act. Taxes
 imposed before the effective date of this Act are governed by the
 law in effect when the taxes were imposed, and that law is continued
 in effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
 taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *