House | 05/27/2015 | Postponed | 5/27/15 5:00 PM | Journal Page: 4814 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4814 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4794 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4793 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4793 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2142 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1213 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 596 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |