Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 815
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 382
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Tagged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
11/17/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|