Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1873 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 24, 2015      TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1873 by Campbell (Relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 171 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking. The bill would require that not later than December 1, 2015, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission adopt rules to require any employees, contractors, or volunteers at an abortion facility or ambulatory surgical center that performs more than 50 abortions in any 12 month period to complete training on human trafficking. The bill would require the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement to make certain training programs available to the personnel. Personnel who begin working or volunteering at a facility prior to September 1, 2015 would have until September 1, 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2015.  Based on the analysis provided by the Health and Human Services Commission, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement, and  Department of State Health Services, it is assumed that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:537 State Health Services, Department of, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, NB, WP, CH, LR, AG    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 24, 2015





  TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1873 by Campbell (Relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1873 by Campbell (Relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking.), As Introduced

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1873 by Campbell (Relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking.), As Introduced

SB1873 by Campbell (Relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 171 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human trafficking. The bill would require that not later than December 1, 2015, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission adopt rules to require any employees, contractors, or volunteers at an abortion facility or ambulatory surgical center that performs more than 50 abortions in any 12 month period to complete training on human trafficking. The bill would require the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement to make certain training programs available to the personnel. Personnel who begin working or volunteering at a facility prior to September 1, 2015 would have until September 1, 2016 to comply with the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2015.  Based on the analysis provided by the Health and Human Services Commission, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement, and  Department of State Health Services, it is assumed that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 537 State Health Services, Department of, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

537 State Health Services, Department of, 407 Commission on Law Enforcement, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: UP, NB, WP, CH, LR, AG

 UP, NB, WP, CH, LR, AG