1 | 1 | | By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1873 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 25, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 5, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 5, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | 6 | | to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1873 By: Schwertner |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to requiring personnel of abortion facilities and certain |
---|
13 | 13 | | other facilities performing abortions to complete training on human |
---|
14 | 14 | | trafficking. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 171, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
17 | 17 | | by adding Subchapter E to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | SUBCHAPTER E. EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS ON TRAFFICKING OF |
---|
19 | 19 | | PERSONS FOR CERTAIN FACILITY PERSONNEL |
---|
20 | 20 | | Sec. 171.081. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies to |
---|
21 | 21 | | each person who: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) is employed by, volunteers at, or performs |
---|
23 | 23 | | services under contract with: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (A) an abortion facility licensed under Chapter |
---|
25 | 25 | | 245; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) an ambulatory surgical center licensed under |
---|
27 | 27 | | Chapter 243 that performs more than 50 abortions in any 12-month |
---|
28 | 28 | | period; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) has direct contact with patients of the facility. |
---|
30 | 30 | | Sec. 171.082. EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS ON |
---|
31 | 31 | | TRAFFICKING OF PERSONS. (a) The executive commissioner of the |
---|
32 | 32 | | Health and Human Services Commission by rule shall develop a |
---|
33 | 33 | | one-time basic education and training program on the trafficking of |
---|
34 | 34 | | persons that: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) consists of at least four hours of training; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) includes a review of the substance of Sections |
---|
37 | 37 | | 20A.02 and 43.05, Penal Code. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (b) The Department of State Health Services shall: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) provide the training program under Subsection (a); |
---|
40 | 40 | | or |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) approve training programs that meet the |
---|
42 | 42 | | requirements of Subsection (a) and provide a list of those programs |
---|
43 | 43 | | on the department's Internet website. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (c) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
45 | 45 | | Services Commission by rule shall require a person described by |
---|
46 | 46 | | Section 171.081 to complete within a reasonable time after |
---|
47 | 47 | | beginning work at the facility the basic education and training |
---|
48 | 48 | | program described by Subsection (a). |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive |
---|
50 | 50 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
51 | 51 | | adopt the rules required by Section 171.082, Health and Safety |
---|
52 | 52 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 3. A person described by Section 171.081, Health |
---|
54 | 54 | | and Safety Code, as added by this Act, who is hired, begins |
---|
55 | 55 | | volunteering, or begins providing services under contract before |
---|
56 | 56 | | September 1, 2015, is not required to comply with Section 171.082, |
---|
57 | 57 | | Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, before September 1, |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2016. |
---|
59 | 59 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
60 | 60 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
61 | 61 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
62 | 62 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
63 | 63 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
64 | 64 | | * * * * * |
---|