E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4674 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | RV#1510 | Journal Page: 4674 |
House | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4674 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4674 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1135 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 601 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |