House | 05/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3109 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1470 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1470 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1470 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1470 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1470 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Garcia | Journal Page: 1453 |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1453 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |