E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3927
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1246
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 3873
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Wu
|
Journal Page: 3873
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3873
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2673
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Perry
|
Journal Page: 1322
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1320
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1319
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|