Senate | 05/05/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 603 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |