LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1913
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1913
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1913
Compare Versions
SB1913 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1913 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1913 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1913 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
SB1913 Engrossed May 8, 2015
SB1913 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
SB1913 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1913 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1913 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1913 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB1913 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
SB1913 Engrossed May 8, 2015
SB1913 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
SB1913 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare