E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5695
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3479
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4794
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4794
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|