Senate | 05/06/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |