6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to undertake a |
---|
8 | 6 | | study of health benefit plans administered by the Teacher |
---|
9 | 7 | | Retirement System of Texas. |
---|
10 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 9 | | SECTION 1. CREATION OF JOINT INTERIM COMMITTEE. (a) A |
---|
12 | 10 | | joint interim committee is created to study and review the health |
---|
13 | 11 | | benefit plans, including TRS-Care and TRS-ActiveCare, operated |
---|
14 | 12 | | under Chapters 1575 and 1579, Insurance Code, and propose reforms |
---|
15 | 13 | | to address issues described by Section 2 of this Act. |
---|
16 | 14 | | (b) The joint interim committee shall be composed of three |
---|
17 | 15 | | senators appointed by the lieutenant governor and three members of |
---|
18 | 16 | | the house of representatives appointed by the speaker of the house |
---|
19 | 17 | | of representatives. |
---|
20 | 18 | | (c) The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of |
---|
21 | 19 | | representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the |
---|
22 | 20 | | joint interim committee members. |
---|
23 | 21 | | (d) The joint interim committee shall convene at the joint |
---|
24 | 22 | | call of the co-chairs. |
---|
25 | 23 | | (e) The joint interim committee has all other powers and |
---|
26 | 24 | | duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the |
---|
27 | 25 | | senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, |
---|
28 | 26 | | Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees |
---|
29 | 27 | | on administration. |
---|
30 | 28 | | SECTION 2. INTERIM STUDY REGARDING CERTAIN HEALTH BENEFIT |
---|
31 | 29 | | PLANS. The joint interim committee created by Section 1 of this Act |
---|
32 | 30 | | shall study the health benefit plans, including TRS-Care and |
---|
33 | 31 | | TRS-ActiveCare, operated under Chapters 1575 and 1579, Insurance |
---|
34 | 32 | | Code, to examine and assess the following issues: |
---|
35 | 33 | | (1) the financial soundness of the plans; |
---|
36 | 34 | | (2) the cost and affordability of plan coverage to |
---|
37 | 35 | | persons eligible for coverage under the plans; and |
---|
38 | 36 | | (3) the sufficiency of access to physicians and health |
---|
39 | 37 | | care providers under the plans. |
---|
40 | 38 | | SECTION 3. COMMITTEE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. |
---|
41 | 39 | | (a) Not later than January 15, 2017, the joint interim committee |
---|
42 | 40 | | shall report the committee's findings and recommendations to the |
---|
43 | 41 | | lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, |
---|
44 | 42 | | and the governor. The joint interim committee shall include in its |
---|
45 | 43 | | recommendations specific statutory and regulatory changes that |
---|
46 | 44 | | appear necessary from the results of the committee's study under |
---|
47 | 45 | | Section 2 of this Act. |
---|
48 | 46 | | (b) Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of |
---|
49 | 47 | | this Act, the lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of |
---|
50 | 48 | | representatives shall appoint the members of the joint interim |
---|
51 | 49 | | committee created under Section 1 of this Act in accordance with |
---|
52 | 50 | | that section. |
---|
53 | 51 | | SECTION 4. ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The joint interim |
---|
54 | 52 | | committee created by this Act is abolished and this Act expires |
---|
55 | 53 | | January 20, 2017. |
---|
56 | 54 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
57 | 55 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
58 | 56 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
59 | 57 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
60 | 58 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 59 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 60 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 61 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 62 | + | May 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 63 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 64 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 65 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the House on |
---|
| 66 | + | May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two |
---|
| 67 | + | present not voting. |
---|
| 68 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 69 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 70 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 71 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 72 | + | Date |
---|
| 73 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 74 | + | Governor |
---|