House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3896 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2833 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 607 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |