Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1958 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1958
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of certain county bail bond board members.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1704.0535, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1704.0535.  ELECTION OF CERTAIN BAIL BOND [SURETY]
 BOARD MEMBERS [MEMBER]. (a)  The board shall annually conduct a
 secret ballot election to elect the members [member] of the board
 who serve [serves] as the representative of licensed bail bond
 sureties and the representative of the criminal defense attorneys
 by electing:
 (1)  a licensed bail bond surety or agent for a
 corporate surety board member; and
 (2)  a criminal defense attorney who is practicing in
 the county.
 (b)  Each individual licensed in the county as a bail bond
 surety or agent for a corporate surety is entitled to cast one vote
 for each license held to elect the board member who is a surety or
 agent for a corporate surety.
 (c)  Each attorney who has a principal place of business
 located in the county and who is not legally prohibited from
 representing criminal defendants in the county is entitled to cast
 one vote to elect the board member who is a criminal defense
 attorney.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act regarding the
 election of certain county bail bond board members do not affect the
 entitlement of a member serving on a board immediately before the
 effective date of this Act to continue to serve and function as a
 member of the board for the remainder of the member's term. Those
 changes in law apply only to a member elected on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *