House | 05/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3895 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1218 | Journal Page: 3843 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Motion to suspend posting rule fails | Journal Page: 3843 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3675 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2830 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1435 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |