E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4794
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4794
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|