E | 05/05/2015 | Effective on 1/1/16 | ||
E | 05/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1340 | |
E | 04/28/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1161 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2061 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1134 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1103 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1849 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1946 | Journal Page: 1838 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 759 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |