Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|