E
|
06/17/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2832
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1433
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4472
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4414
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1414
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
27-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
26-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4410
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
24-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4410
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
25-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4410
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
24-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4410
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4410
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
19-Flynn
|
Journal Page: 4405
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4398
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4380
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA16 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 914
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 908
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 873
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 873
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|