Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2004 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/18/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife, Nelson S.B. No. 2004


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deferred maintenance for state facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of
 the house of representatives shall each appoint three members to a
 Joint Oversight Committee on Government Facilities. The members of
 the committee shall elect a chair.
 (b)  If this act become effective immediately, the
 lieutenant governor and speaker shall make the appointments not
 later than July 1, 2015. If this act becomes effective September 1,
 2015, the lieutenant governor and speaker shall make the
 appointments not later than September 15, 2015.
 (c)  The committee established under this section may meet to
 review deferred maintenance plans and to receive implementation
 updates.
 (d)  The committee shall provide a biannual written status
 report to the legislature which includes the amount of money
 appropriated from the deferred maintenance fund, the deferred
 maintenance projects to be completed through appropriations of the
 fund, and the status of ongoing and completed projects.
 (e)  The committee established under this section may
 exercise any powers of a joint committee. The cost of operation of
 the committee may be borne in the same manner as the cost of a joint
 committee. The Texas Legislative Council may provide funding for
 the operations of the committees. To the extent not inconsistent
 with this resolution, the joint rules adopted by the 84th
 Legislature for the administration of joint interim legislative
 study committees apply to the committee established under this
 section.
 (f)  This section expires January 8, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 2165, Government Code, is amending by
 adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I.  DEFERRED MAINTENANCE FUND
 Sec. 2165.401.  PURPOSE; INTENT. It is the intent of the
 legislature that state facilities be brought into a better state of
 repair to ensure the safety of employees and visitors, the
 efficiency of building operations and a long-term reduction in
 repair costs by addressing deferred maintenance needs. Funds under
 this subchapter are intended to fund projects to this purpose.
 Sec. 2165.402.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "fund"
 means the deferred maintenance fund.
 Sec. 2165.403.  DEFERRED MAINTENANCE FUND ACCOUNT. (a) The
 deferred maintenance fund is an account in the general revenue
 fund. (b) The fund consists of money credited, appropriated, or
 transferred to the fund at the direction of the legislature.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.