Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2004 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Eltife, et al. S.B. No. 2004
 (Geren)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deferred maintenance funding for state facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The Joint Oversight Committee on Government
 Facilities is created to review deferred maintenance plans and
 receive implementation updates.
 (b)  The committee is composed of six members as follows:
 (1)  three members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor; and
 (2)  three members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (c)  The committee chair shall alternate annually between a
 member of the senate appointed by the lieutenant governor and a
 member of the house of representatives appointed by the speaker,
 beginning with a member of the senate.
 (d)  If this Act takes effect immediately, the lieutenant
 governor and the speaker of the house of representatives shall make
 appointments to the committee not later than July 1, 2015. If this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015, the lieutenant governor and
 speaker shall make appointments to the committee not later than
 September 15, 2015.
 (e)  The committee shall biannually provide a written status
 report to the legislature that includes the amount of money
 expended from the deferred maintenance fund, the deferred
 maintenance projects to be completed through expenditures from the
 fund, and the status of ongoing and completed projects.
 (f)  The committee may exercise any powers of a joint
 committee. The cost of operation of the committee may be borne in
 the same manner as the cost of a joint committee. The Texas
 Legislative Council may provide funding for the operations of the
 committee. To the extent not inconsistent with this Act, the joint
 rules adopted by the 84th Legislature for the administration of
 joint interim legislative study committees apply to the committee.
 (g)  This section expires and the committee is abolished
 January 8, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 2165, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I.  DEFERRED MAINTENANCE FUND
 Sec. 2165.401.  PURPOSE; INTENT. It is the intent of the
 legislature that state facilities be brought into a better state of
 repair to ensure the safety of employees and visitors, the
 efficiency of building operations, and a long-term reduction in
 repair costs by addressing deferred maintenance issues. The
 deferred maintenance fund is created to fund projects for this
 purpose.
 Sec. 2165.402.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "fund"
 means the deferred maintenance fund.
 Sec. 2165.403.  DEFERRED MAINTENANCE FUND ACCOUNT. (a)  The
 fund is an account in the general revenue fund.
 (b)  The fund consists of money appropriated, credited, or
 transferred to the fund by or at the direction of the legislature.
 (c)  Section 403.095 does not apply to the fund.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.