House
|
05/27/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4800
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4800
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3844
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|