House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4087 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1804 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1804 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1804 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Lucio | Journal Page: 1803 |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1803 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1802 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 619 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |